HI HCR168 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Convening Of A Task Force To Evaluate And Identify Potential Sources And Means Of Funding Available To Provide Support For And Help Maintain The Hawaii Wildlife Center Facility And Hawaii's Endangered Wildlife.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Convening Of A Task Force To Evaluate And Identify Potential Sources And Means Of Funding Available To Provide Support For And Help Maintain The Hawaii Wildlife Center Facility And Hawaii's Endangered Wildlife.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2019-05-03SenateReceived notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 889).
2019-05-02HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
2019-05-02HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-04-18HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 913) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-18SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-17SenateOne Day Notice 04-18-19.
2019-04-17SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2172) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-12SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-09SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-12-19 2:21PM in conference room 224.
2019-04-09SenateRe-Referred to AEN.
2019-04-09SenateReferred to CPH/AEN.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 624).
2019-04-04HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2004), recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt.
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308.
2019-03-25HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
2019-03-25HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1711), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
2019-03-15HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 325.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR150 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback