HI HCR173 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - (S) Referred to HRE/PSM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - (S) Referred to HRE/PSM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The National Disaster Preparedness Training Center At The University Of Hawaii At Manoa To Prepare A Report On The Civil Defense Preparedness Response To The February, 2010 Tsunami Threat.
Title
Emergency and Natural Disaster Preparedness Report
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Chang [D] | Rep. Denny Coffman [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] |
Rep. Robert Herkes [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | (S) Referred to HRE/PSM. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 502). | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Bertram, Hanohano, McKelvey, Sagum excused. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1319-10), recommending adoption. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har. | |
2010-04-05 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-07-10 2:15PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Belatti, Berg, Chang, Mizuno, M. Oshiro, Shimabukuro, Thielen excused. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 939-10), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Aquino, Awana, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Souki, Takumi, Yamashita, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-18-10 9:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2010-03-09 | (H) Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 44 | |
2010-03-08 | (H) Offered | |
2010-03-05 | (H) To be offered. |