HI HCR175 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR175
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 940) in amended form (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 940) in amended form (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii State Commission On The Status Of Women To Maintain A Database On Sex Trafficking Offenses.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii State Commission On The Status Of Women To Maintain A Database On Sex Trafficking Offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 940) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-22-19. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2189) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-19 10:10AM in conference room 414. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 625). |
2019-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-04 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2064) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan. |
2019-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1879) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD. |
2019-03-22 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 03-22-19 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR175 (Carry Over) 2019-04-22 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 940) in amended form (SD 1).
HR154 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HR154 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).