HI HCR176 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR176
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Environmental Services Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Convene A Working Group To Address The Illegal Dumping Of Bulky Items And Propose Alternative Solutions To The Existing Bulky Item Pilot Program.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Environmental Services Of The City And County Of Honolulu To Convene A Working Group To Address The Illegal Dumping Of Bulky Items And Propose Alternative Solutions To The Existing Bulky Item Pilot Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR155 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325.
HCR176 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR176 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=176&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR176_.HTM |