HI HCR18 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR18
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Counties To Develop Procedures To Accept Donations Of Certain Lands.
Title
Requesting The Counties To Develop Procedures To Accept Donations Of Certain Lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2020-01-21 | House | Offered |
2020-01-17 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR16 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325.
HCR18 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to TRN/TIA, FIN, referral sheet 27
HCR18 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to TRN/TIA, FIN, referral sheet 27
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=18&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR18_.HTM |