HI HCR202 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-29 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-29 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Convening Of A Working Group To Recommend Ways To Reduce Incidents Of Sepsis And Sepsis Deaths In The State.
Title
Sepsis; Sepsis Deaths; Department of Health; Working Group
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 747). |
2014-04-29 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2014-04-29 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2014-04-21 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 701) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3487) with recommendation of adoption. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Tokuda, Slom. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3469), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-17-14 10:55AM in conference room 211. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-15-14 9:10AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 487). |
2014-04-03 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-03 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1496-14), recommending adoption. |
2014-04-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson. |
2014-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-31 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-02-14 3:35PM in conference room 308. |
2014-03-25 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2). |
2014-03-25 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1306-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-03-21 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan, Oshiro. |
2014-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-21-14 9:00AM in conference room 329. |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR159 (Same As) 2014-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.