HI HCR202 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declaring April As Child Abuse Prevention Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Declaring April As Child Abuse Prevention Month.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2019-04-22HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 932).
2019-04-22SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-22SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2222) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-16SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, J.Keohokalole.
2019-04-12SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-19 9:05AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-11SenateRe-Referred to CPH.
2019-04-09SenateReferred to LCA.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 631).
2019-04-04HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2047), recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan.
2019-04-01HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-28HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1891), recommending referral to JUD.
2019-03-22HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-19HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 03-22-19 8:30AM in conference room 329.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR182 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback