HI HCR203 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Human Services To Examine The Implementation Of Act 217, Session Laws Of Hawaii 2018, Regarding Misrepresentation Of Service Animals.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Human Services To Examine The Implementation Of Act 217, Session Laws Of Hawaii 2018, Regarding Misrepresentation Of Service Animals.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 03-22-19 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR183 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=203&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HCR203_.HTM |