HI HCR204 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-26 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 748).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-26 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 748).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Director Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Establish A Working Group To Study, Consider, And Recommend Ways To Reduce The Transport Time And Cost Of Shipping Goods To Oahu From Molokai, Lanai, And Hana, Maui.
Title
Working Group; Shipping; Maui to Oahu
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 748). |
2013-04-25 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-25 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McDermott, Thielen excused (2). |
2013-04-25 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2013-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 732) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported from EGH/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1606) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Espero, Gabbard, Kahele, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Baker, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, English, L. Thielen. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-19-13 3:00PM in conference room 423. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Referred to EGH/TIA. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 645). |
2013-04-11 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-11 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Oshiro excused (2). |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported from TRN/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1625) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2013-04-03 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Brower, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ward, Cachola. |
2013-04-03 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Hashem, Ing, Nakashima, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Takumi. |
2013-03-28 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN/EDB on Wednesday, 04-03-13 11:10AM in conference room 309. |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to TRN/EDB, referral sheet 40 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=204&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HCR204_.HTM |