HI HCR205 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on LMG as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on LMG as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Management Audit Of The Department Of Health Sanitation Branch.
Title
Department of Health Sanitation Branch; Management Audit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on LMG as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll excused (1). |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported from HLT/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1340) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to LMG. |
2013-03-28 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Coffman, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano. |
2013-03-28 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Cheape. |
2013-03-25 | House | Measure has been re-scheduled. Proposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT/EEP on Thursday, 03-28-13 10:00AM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-27 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-27-13 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2013-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT/EEP on Wednesday, 03-27-13 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to HLT/EEP, LMG, referral sheet 40 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |