HI HCR216 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Supporting The Development Of College Esports At The University Of Hawaii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting The Development Of College Esports At The University Of Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 884).
2019-04-30HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-04-22HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 942) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-22SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-18SenateOne Day Notice 04-22-19.
2019-04-18SenateReported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2178) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-15SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, K. Kahele, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
2019-04-11SenateThe committee(s) on HRE added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 04-15-19 2:00PM in conference room 414.
2019-04-09SenateReferred to HRE.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 633).
2019-04-04HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseAdopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2052) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan.
2019-04-01HouseProposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-28HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1876), recommending referral to JUD.
2019-03-22HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-19HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 03-22-19 8:30AM in conference room 329.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback