HI HCR218 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting A Task Force To Review And Report On The Establishment Of Fair And Proportional Fines For Certain Penalties In Hawaii To Ensure A Fair And Meaningful Deterrent To Illegal Behavior For Individuals Across The Economic Spectrum.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting A Task Force To Review And Report On The Establishment Of Fair And Proportional Fines For Certain Penalties In Hawaii To Ensure A Fair And Meaningful Deterrent To Illegal Behavior For Individuals Across The Economic Spectrum.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 884).
2019-04-30HouseAdopted with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-04-22HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 943) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-22SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-18SenateOne Day Notice 04-22-19.
2019-04-18SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2188) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-16SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-12SenateThe committee(s) on JDC added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 04-16-19 10:10AM in conference room 414.
2019-04-12SenateRe-Referred to JDC.
2019-04-03SenateReferred to JDC/WAM.
2019-04-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 529).
2019-04-02HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-02HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Saiki, Todd, Yamane excused (4).
2019-04-02HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1950), recommending adoption.
2019-03-22HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Yamane.
2019-03-20HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-22-19 2:10PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR193 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback