HI HCR25 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Agriculture And Hawaii Tourism Authority To Report To The Legislature On The Processing Of State Of Hawaii Plant And Animal Declaration Forms, Including The Costs Involved.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Agriculture And Hawaii Tourism Authority To Report To The Legislature On The Processing Of State Of Hawaii Plant And Animal Declaration Forms, Including The Costs Involved.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2019-05-03SenateReceived notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 889).
2019-05-02HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
2019-05-02HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-04-18HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 910) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-18SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-17SenateOne Day Notice 04-18-19.
2019-04-17SenateReported from AEN/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2174) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-12SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, J.Keohokalole.
2019-04-12SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Fevella.
2019-04-08SenateThe committee(s) on AEN/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 04-12-19 2:00PM in conference room 224.
2019-04-09SenateReferred to AEN/EET.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 597).
2019-04-04HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2017), recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt.
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308.
2019-03-28HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from AGR/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1855) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cachola, Holt, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, Cachola, Creagan, DeCoite, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa.
2019-03-15HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by AGR/TIA on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:00AM in conference room 312.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to AGR/TIA, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-02-28HouseOffered
2019-02-25HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR30 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback