HI HCR28 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to EDU.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Encouraging The Department Of Education And Other Stakeholders To Meet As A Working Group For Sexual-violence Prevention In Public Schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Encouraging The Department Of Education And Other Stakeholders To Meet As A Working Group For Sexual-violence Prevention In Public Schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateReferred to EDU.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 598).
2019-04-04HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2056), recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan.
2019-04-01HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-28HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1780) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD.
2019-03-18HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Perruso, DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Johanson, Tokioka, Okimoto.
2019-03-14HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by LHE on Monday, 03-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 309.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LHE, JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-02-28HouseOffered
2019-02-26HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR33 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback