HI HCR33 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to LCA.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Endorsing Taiwan's Participation As An Observer In The United Nations Framework Convention On Climate Change, International Civil Aviation Organization, World Health Organization, And International Criminal Police Organization; Encouraging A U.s.-taiwan Bilateral Trade Agreement; And Celebrating The State Of Hawaii's Twenty-sixth Anniversary Of Sister-state Relations With Taiwan And The Fortieth Anniversary Of The Taiwan Relations Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Endorsing Taiwan's Participation As An Observer In The United Nations Framework Convention On Climate Change, International Civil Aviation Organization, World Health Organization, And International Criminal Police Organization; Encouraging A U.s.-taiwan Bilateral Trade Agreement; And Celebrating The State Of Hawaii's Twenty-sixth Anniversary Of Sister-state Relations With Taiwan And The Fortieth Anniversary Of The Taiwan Relations Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateReferred to LCA.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 600).
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2053), recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan.
2019-04-01HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-27HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
2019-03-27HouseReported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1735), recommending referral to JUD.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, Cachola, Creagan, DeCoite, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa.
2019-03-15HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by TIA on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:15AM in conference room 312.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to TIA, JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-05HouseOffered
2019-03-01HouseTo be offered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback