HI HCR36 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR36
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-4)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-4)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Governor's Coordinator On Homelessness And The City And County Of Honolulu To Come Together And Prioritize Their Homelessness Efforts In The Area Surrounding The Hawaii Children's Discovery Center By Convening A Task Force.
Title
Urging The Governor's Coordinator On Homelessness And The City And County Of Honolulu To Come Together And Prioritize Their Homelessness Efforts In The Area Surrounding The Hawaii Children's Discovery Center By Convening A Task Force.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 923). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-22-19. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2180) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-15-19 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to HMS. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 601). |
2019-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2014), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt. |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308. |
2019-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1893), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-22 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 03-22-19 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-07 | House | Offered |
2019-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR36 (Carry Over) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=36&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HCR36_.HTM |