HI HCR55 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Governor To Convene A Working Group To Make Recommendations On The Consolidation Of State Environmental Functions And The Establishment Of A Department Of The Environment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Governor To Convene A Working Group To Make Recommendations On The Consolidation Of State Environmental Functions And The Establishment Of A Department Of The Environment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2019-05-03SenateReceived notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 889).
2019-05-02HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
2019-05-02HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-04-18HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 911) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-18SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-17SenateOne Day Notice 04-18-19.
2019-04-17SenateReported from AEN/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2173) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-12SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, Fevella.
2019-04-12SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-09SenateThe committee(s) on AEN/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 04-12-19 2:20PM in conference room 224.
2019-04-09SenateRe-Referred to AEN/GVO.
2019-04-09SenateReferred to AEN/GVO/WAM.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 604).
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2015), recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt.
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308.
2019-03-28HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1866) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-21HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
2019-03-19HouseProposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-21-19 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-18HouseRe-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 36
2019-03-14HouseReferred to PVM/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered
2019-03-07HouseTo be offered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback