HI HCR63 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR63
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of The Auditor To Conduct A Study On Whether The Scope Of Persons Authorized To Work As Insurance Appraisers And Insurance Umpires In The State Needs To Be Regulated.
Title
Requesting The Office Of The Auditor To Conduct A Study On Whether The Scope Of Persons Authorized To Work As Insurance Appraisers And Insurance Umpires In The State Needs To Be Regulated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-03-29 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 04-02-19 11:30AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-03-28 | House | Re-referred to IAC, referral sheet 44 |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to IAC/CPC, LMG, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
2019-03-07 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR63 (Carry Over) 2019-04-02 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HR64 (Same As) 2019-04-02 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HR64 (Same As) 2019-04-02 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=63&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HCR63_.HTM |