HI HCR74 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR74
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reaffirming The Use Of The Term "deaf-blind" By The State Of Hawaii And The Counties.
Title
Reaffirming The Use Of The Term "deaf-blind" By The State Of Hawaii And The Counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1892), recommending referral to JUD. |
2019-03-22 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 03-22-19 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
2019-03-07 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR74 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=74&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HCR74_.HTM |