HI HCR93 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR93
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to WLH, CPC, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to WLH, CPC, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Convening Of A Task Force To Examine The Creation And Regulation Of Homeowners Associations For Prestatehood Subdivisions.
Title
Requesting The Convening Of A Task Force To Examine The Creation And Regulation Of Homeowners Associations For Prestatehood Subdivisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to WLH, CPC, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-05 | House | Offered |
2020-03-04 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR74 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to WLH, CPC, referral sheet 40
HCR93 (Carry Over) 2019-04-09 - Referred to CPH/WAM.
HCR93 (Carry Over) 2019-04-09 - Referred to CPH/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=93&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR93_.HTM |