HI HR13 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR13
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Convening A Task Force To Address Implementation Of Hawaii's State Law Corollary To Title Ix In Light Of Anticipated Changes To Federal Title Ix Regulations.
Title
Convening A Task Force To Address Implementation Of Hawaii's State Law Corollary To Title Ix In Light Of Anticipated Changes To Federal Title Ix Regulations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309. |
2020-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LHE on Monday, 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to LHE, JUD, referral sheet 39 |
2020-01-21 | House | Offered |
2020-01-17 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR15 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
HR13 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 27
SR7 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
HR13 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 27
SR7 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=13&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HR13_.HTM |