HI HR140 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State To Develop A Plan To Implement A Three-year Earned-time Pilot Program To Allow Inmates Under The Jurisdiction Of The Department Of Public Safety To Earn Credit Toward Reducing Their Minimum Term Of Imprisonment.
Title
Earned-Time Program; Department of Public Safety; Department of the Attorney General; Hawaii Paroling Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1). |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1333) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD. |
2013-03-28 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Hashem, Ichiyama, Yamane, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Takumi, McDermott. |
2013-03-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-28-13 11:00AM in conference room 309. |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 40 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR172 (Same As) 2013-04-02 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=140&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HR140_.HTM |