HI HR141 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR141
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 9:00AM in conference room 312.
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 9:00AM in conference room 312.
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing And Commemorating The One Hundred Twentieth Anniversary Of The Okinawan Immigration To Hawaii.
Title
Recognizing And Commemorating The One Hundred Twentieth Anniversary Of The Okinawan Immigration To Hawaii.
Sponsors
Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2020-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TIA on Tuesday, 03-17-20 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR162 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 9:00AM in conference room 312.
HR141 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33
HR141 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=141&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HR141_.HTM |