HI HR142 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR142
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Establishment Of A Native Hawaiian Intellectual Property Task Force To Develop A Sui Generis Legal System To Recognize And Protect Native Hawaiian Cultural Intellectual Property, Traditional Cultural Expressions, And Genetic Resources.
Title
Urging The Establishment Of A Native Hawaiian Intellectual Property Task Force To Develop A Sui Generis Legal System To Recognize And Protect Native Hawaiian Cultural Intellectual Property, Traditional Cultural Expressions, And Genetic Resources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2057), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan. |
2019-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1842), recommending referral to JUD. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Lowen. |
2019-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-27-19 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR142 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR155 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 939) in amended form (SD 1).
HCR155 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 939) in amended form (SD 1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=142&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HR142_.HTM |