HI HR148 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR148
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Education To Increase Access And Equity To Dual Credit Programs.
Title
Urging The Department Of Education To Increase Access And Equity To Dual Credit Programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309. |
2020-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LHE on Monday, 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309. |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR169 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:20PM in conference room 309.
HR148 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33
HR148 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=148&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HR148_.HTM |