HI HR150 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR150
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Health To Convene A Task Force To Evaluate And Identify Potential Sources And Means Of Funding Available To Provide Support For And Help Maintain The Hawaii Wildlife Center Facility And Hawaii's Endangered Wildlife.
Title
Urging The Department Of Health To Convene A Task Force To Evaluate And Identify Potential Sources And Means Of Funding Available To Provide Support For And Help Maintain The Hawaii Wildlife Center Facility And Hawaii's Endangered Wildlife.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2003), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt. |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308. |
2019-03-25 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6). |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1710), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. |
2019-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR150 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR168 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR168 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=150&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HR150_.HTM |