HI HR198 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Education To Offer Vegetarian Lunch Meals In All Public Schools At Least Once Weekly.
Title
Urging The Department Of Education To Offer Vegetarian Lunch Meals In All Public Schools At Least Once Weekly.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] |
Rep. Lisa Kitagawa [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1787) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-18 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Perruso, DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Johanson, Tokioka, Okimoto. |
2019-03-14 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LHE on Monday, 03-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR223 (Same As) 2019-05-06 - Resolution adopted in final form.