HI HR226 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requests the Division of Boating and Ocean Recreation of the Department of Land and Natural Resources to conduct a study on the feasibility of assessing commercial operations that occur at or commence from private boating facilities and use the nearshore waters of the State to generate revenue fees.
Title
Requests the Division of Boating and Ocean Recreation of the Department of Land and Natural Resources to conduct a study on the feasibility of assessing commercial operations that occur at or commence from private boating facilities and use the nearshore waters of the State to generate revenue fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-15 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Chong, Herkes, Kawakami, McKelvey, Thielen, Tokioka excused. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1687), recommending adoption. | |
2011-04-13 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Har, Kawakami, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward. | |
2011-04-11 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-13-11 10:00AM in conference room 308. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 52 | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 43 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR264 (Same As) 2011-04-19 - (S) Referred to WLH/WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=226 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HR226_.HTM |