HI HR39 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR39
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing The Fiftieth Anniversary Of The Enactment Of Chapter 89, Hawaii Revised Statutes, And Urging The Hawaii Labor Relations Board To Construe Chapter 89, Hawaii Revised Statutes, In Accordance With Tradition.
Title
Recognizing The Fiftieth Anniversary Of The Enactment Of Chapter 89, Hawaii Revised Statutes, And Urging The Hawaii Labor Relations Board To Construe Chapter 89, Hawaii Revised Statutes, In Accordance With Tradition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2020-02-27 | House | Offered |
2020-02-26 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR54 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 39
HR39 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HR39 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=39&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HR39_.HTM |