HI HR46 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Manage The Waianae Kai Forest And Restore Water Flow In Waianae Streams For Native Hawaiian Traditional And Customary Practices And Implementation Of The Waianae Kai Wildfire Preparedness Plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Manage The Waianae Kai Forest And Restore Water Flow In Waianae Streams For Native Hawaiian Traditional And Customary Practices And Implementation Of The Waianae Kai Wildfire Preparedness Plan.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1840), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-27HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Lowen.
2019-03-22HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-27-19 9:30AM in conference room 325.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-07HouseOffered
2019-03-06HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR48 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback