HI SB1 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the ALOHA homes program under the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation (HHFDC) to facilitate the development of low-cost homes for sale to Hawaii residents on state-owned and county-owned land near rail stations of the Honolulu rail transit system, to be known as the urban redevelopment district. Establishes guidelines within the urban redevelopment district and provisions related to the sale of leasehold interest of ALOHA homes. Exempts lands to which HHFDC holds title and land set aside or leased to HHFDC from the definition of public lands in section 1712, HRS, except for purposes of accounting for receipts from ceded lands. Establishes and appropriates funds into and out of the ALOHA homes revolving fund. Authorizes HHFDC to sell the leasehold interest in residential condominium units located on state lands for lease terms of 99 years. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/TRN/WLH on Thursday, 03-14-19 10:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HSG/TRN/WLH, JUD/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 29) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 973) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from HOU/WTL/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 311) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Baker. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/WTL/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU/WTL/GVO, WAM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to HOU/WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen.
HB1141 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSG/TRN/WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1141 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HSG/TRN/WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
ALOHA Homes Program
Appropriation ($)
HHFDC
Housing
Leasehold Condominiums on Lands Controlled by the State
Transitoriented Development
Urban Redevelopment District
Appropriation ($)
HHFDC
Housing
Leasehold Condominiums on Lands Controlled by the State
Transitoriented Development
Urban Redevelopment District