HI SB10 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB10
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the office of the affordable housing advocate to work with all state agencies that manage land to solve the housing shortage, and monitor, comment, and report on the State's production of affordable housing units, the development and implementation of laws, regulations, and policies relating to affordable housing. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from GVO/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 638) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Fevella. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to GVO/HOU, WAM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB10 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Affordable Housing Advocate
Office of the Affordable Housing Advocate
Publicly-subsidized Affordable and Public Housing
Office of the Affordable Housing Advocate
Publicly-subsidized Affordable and Public Housing