HI SB1006 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1006
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes certain spirits-based beverages in the definition of cooler beverage. Repeals definition of draft beer. Applies the same tax rate to all beer. (SB1006 HD1)
Title
Relating To Intoxicating Liquor.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4). |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1370) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-03-14 | House | Re-referred to EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-13 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matsumoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 03-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to EDB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 330) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 872) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 382) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman, Fevella. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM/CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1006 (Carry Over) 2019-03-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
HB887 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB887 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.