HI SB1007 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1007
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Redirects the $1,000,000 of transient accommodations tax revenues currently allocated to operate a Hawaiian center and the museum of Hawaiian music and dance at the Hawaii convention center to have the State of Hawaii Museum of Natural and Cultural History plan, design, and construct such a facility on their property.
Title
Relating To Hawaiian Music And Dance.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EET/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 192) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 2:55PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET/HWN, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1007 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
HB3 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to WLH/TIA, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB3 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to WLH/TIA, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaiian Music and Dance
State of Hawaii Museum of Natural and Cultural History
Transient Accommodations Tax
State of Hawaii Museum of Natural and Cultural History
Transient Accommodations Tax
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1007&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1007_.HTM |