HI SB101 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB101
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-31-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-31-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii medical board to establish standards for health care providers to follow to ensure that a patient's consent to treatment is an informed consent. Requires that informed consent for a proposed medical or surgical treatment or a diagnostic or therapeutic procedure be obtained prior to the day of that treatment or procedure. Specifies that if the treatment or procedure is to occur on the same day it is scheduled, the informed consent shall be obtained at the time the decision is made to schedule that treatment or procedure.
Title
Relating To Medical Informed Consent.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-31-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB101 (Carry Over) 2019-01-29 - The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-31-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
HB271 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB271 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=101&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB101_.HTM |