HI SB1020 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 1:15PM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to the Hawaii Public Housing Authority for its Rent Supplement Program to assist families at imminent risk of homelessness due to domestic violence with obtaining and maintaining permanent housing. (SB1020 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Rental Assistance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 1:15PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: S. Chang Chair; Ruderman, Moriwaki Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Eli, Gates, Ward.
2019-04-05HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
2019-04-05SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-04SenateDeferred One Day 04-05-19.
2019-04-04SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 553).
2019-04-03HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-03HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1975), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-20HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-20HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1451) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-15HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say, Tokioka; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
2019-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 03-15-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 335) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1048) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:05AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-14SenateReported from HOU/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 375) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Ihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Fevella.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Fevella.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on HOU/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 3:10PM in conference room 016.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to HOU/HMS, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback