HI SB1026 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1026
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the Healthy Aging Partnership Program to further the program's role in improving the health and well-being of Hawaii's kupuna. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Healthy Aging Partnership Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 340) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1049) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 450) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Riviere. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1026 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27
HB468 (Same As) 2019-06-28 - Act 124, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1226).
HB468 (Same As) 2019-06-28 - Act 124, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1226).