HI SB1033 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1033
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows boards to file notice of public meetings with the office of the lieutenant governor or appropriate county clerk's office via electronic mail.
Title
Relating To Board Meetings.
Sponsors
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-16 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-17 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1033 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1033&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB1033_.HTM |