HI SB1035 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1035
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the civil statute of limitations for child sexual abuse. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Sexual Violence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 346) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Rhoads). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 831) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-22-19 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-19 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1035 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
HB482 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB482 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3