HI SB1037 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on July 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-05 - Act 175, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the offense of abuse of family or household member by amending the type of physical abuse that constitutes strangulation to include blocking the nose and mouth or applying pressure to the chest. Clarifies that infliction of a visible bodily injury is not required to establish the offense. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Domestic Violence.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-05SenateAct 175, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277).
2019-07-05HouseAct 175, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277).
2019-05-03SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-26HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 965).
2019-04-26SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-26HouseDeferred one day 04-30-19.
2019-04-24HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-26-19.
2019-04-24HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 5) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-24Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-19.
2019-04-24SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 5).
2019-04-17HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Morikawa, San Buenaventura, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-17SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
2019-04-16SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-19 4:30PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: C. Lee Chair; Morikawa, San Buenaventura, Thielen.
2019-04-12HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 899).
2019-04-12SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Gabbard, Kim, Fevella.
2019-04-05HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
2019-04-05SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 589).
2019-04-04HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-03HouseDeferred one day 04-04-19.
2019-04-01HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, McKelvey, Saiki, Todd excused (4).
2019-04-01HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1919) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-18HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey, Yamane.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-15HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-19.
2019-03-14HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-15-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-14HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-19 at 2:00pm.
2019-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-14-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 348) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-28SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 782) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
2019-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-22-19 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-19 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to JDC.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB489 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback