HI SB1040 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1040
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the State Commission on the Status of Women to maintain a database on sex trafficking. Requires reports to the Legislature. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Sex Trafficking.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 432) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1040 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
HB487 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB487 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3