HI SB105 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Vetoed on 07/13/2015 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1329).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Vetoed on 07/13/2015 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1329).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the inclusion, in the six-year program and financial plan and budget, of a summary of the annual debt service for bonds issued to finance capital improvement projects. States intent that the provisions also apply to the judiciary budget by operation of existing law. Effective 7/1/2016. (CD1)
Title
Budget Documents; CIP Estimated Debt Service
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | Senate | Vetoed on 07/13/2015 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1329). |
2015-07-13 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1329). |
2015-06-29 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1243) |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/29/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1243) |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 82) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 82). |
2015-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2015-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-27-15 3:05PM in conference room 309. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Yamashita, Pouha. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Kouchi, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 480). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (4). |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1520) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-03-19 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-19-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 57) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 557) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-13-15 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-11-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |