HI SB1055 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the governor, lieutenant governor, members of the legislature, governor-appointed executive of each principal department, president of the University of Hawaii, superintendent of education, administrative director of the State, administrative director of the courts, and the administrator of the office of Hawaiian affairs to disclose any income of $1,000 or more received from a business or service, the name of the person or business from whom the income was received, date the income was received, and a description of the services or goods rendered. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Financial Disclosure Statements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2019-02-13SenateReported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 285) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2019-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
2019-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 2:45PM in conference room 225.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to GVO, JDC/WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback