HI SB1061 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1061
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Assesses a $10 motor vehicle importation fee for each motor vehicle that is imported into the State, due to the county that is the final destination of the vehicle. Provides that revenue from the motor vehicle importation fee shall be expended for the disposal of abandoned vehicles.
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee on TRS deferred the measure. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to TRS, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1061 (Carry Over) 2019-02-04 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1061&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1061_.HTM |