HI SB107 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Act 010, 04/17/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the ballot of an absentee or military-overseas voter is valid even if the voter becomes ineligible to vote after casting the ballot. Repeals the requirement that an absentee voter's ballot be deemed invalid if the voter returns the return envelope but dies prior to the opening of polls. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Voting.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateAct 010, 04/17/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111).
2019-04-18HouseAct 010, on 04/17/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111).
2019-04-01SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-04-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 516).
2019-03-29HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Say, Tokioka excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-28HousePassed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1901), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-18HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey, Yamane.
2019-03-11HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-11HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-19.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 47) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-28SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 776) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-01-17SenateReferred to JDC.
2019-01-17SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback