HI SB1079 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-26 - Act 056, 4/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1156).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-26 - Act 056, 4/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1156).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prepares for implementation of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act of 2010 by applying the producer licensing requirements of chapter 431:9A, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to insurance producers selling health insurance products offered by mutual benefit societies and health maintenance organizations. Effective July 1, 2013. (SB1079 HD1)
Title
Health Insurance
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | Senate | Act 056, 4/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1156). |
2013-04-26 | House | Act 056, on 4/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1156). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 696). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: McKelvey Chair; Belatti, McDermott. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-16-13. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-16-13. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 595). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-04 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1445) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Evans, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Ito, McDermott. |
2013-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-01-13 2:25PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-13. |
2013-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-27-13 4:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-22 | House | Re-referred to CPC, referral sheet 42 |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2013-02-15 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-02-14 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 22). |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-14-13. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 246) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB848 (Same As) 2013-06-26 - Act 192, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1295).