HI SB1082 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 257, 7/2/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1360).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Deletes statutory language specifying considerations and provisions for contracting transportation for school children. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation of School Children; Contracting Provisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateAct 257, 7/2/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1360).
2013-07-09HouseAct 257, on 7/2/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1360).
2013-04-29SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2013-04-26SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 749).
2013-04-25HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 747).
2013-04-25HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McDermott, Thielen excused (2).
2013-04-25SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Nishihara.
2013-04-23Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-25-13.
2013-04-23HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-25-13.
2013-04-23HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 4) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-23SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 4).
2013-04-18HouseReceived notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).
2013-04-18HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ing, Takai, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-18SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2013-04-18SenateSenator(s) Kidani replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s).
2013-04-17SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-18-13 3:00PM in conference room 329.
2013-04-16SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-13 3:00PM in conference room 329.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Takumi, Ing Co-Chairs; Takai, Fale.
2013-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
2013-04-15SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Tokuda, Chair; English, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Slom.
2013-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
2013-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2013-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 596).
2013-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice, Tuesday 04-09-13.
2013-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1539) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-04-02HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ward.
2013-03-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2013-03-20HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Choy, Hashem, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (6).
2013-03-20HouseReported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1058) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2013-03-13HouseThe committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Choy, Hanohano, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takai, Cheape, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino.
2013-03-11HouseThe committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-13-13 at 2:00pm.
2013-03-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-11-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
2013-03-07HouseReferred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 30
2013-03-07HousePass First Reading
2013-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 294) in amended form (SD 1).
2013-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
2013-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 726) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2013-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2013-02-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2013-02-13SenateReported from EDU/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 242) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2013-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Dela Cruz, Espero, Gabbard, Kahele, Kouchi, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2013-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2013-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on EDU/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-13 1:15PM in conference room 414.
2013-01-24SenateReferred to EDU/TIA, WAM.
2013-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB851 (Same As) 2013-02-06 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Say excused (2).

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback