HI SB1092 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 266, 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1369).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes a general fund appropriation of $50,000,000 for fiscal year 2013-2014 to recapitalize the hurricane reserve trust fund. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hurricane Reserve Trust Fund; Recapitalization; Appropriation ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateAct 266, 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1369).
2013-07-09HouseAct 266, on 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1369).
2013-05-07SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Ige.
2013-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
2013-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 147) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 147).
2013-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Woodson, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Galuteria, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2013-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 1:30PM in conference room 309.
2013-04-22HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 3:15PM in conference room 309.
2013-04-18HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 3:15PM in conference room 309.
2013-04-17HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 3:15PM in conference room 309.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Luke Chair; Nishimoto, Woodson, Johanson.
2013-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
2013-04-15SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Galuteria, Kidani, Slom.
2013-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
2013-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2013-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 600).
2013-04-09HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, McKelvey excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-04-09HouseFloor amendment failed following a voice vote: Noes, 6 (Representative(s) Evans, Johanson, Luke, Nishimoto, Saiki, Souki). Excused, 2 (Representative(s) Cabanilla, McKelvey).
2013-04-09HouseFloor Amendment No. 18 offered by Rep. Say.
2013-04-04HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2013-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1447) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-03-14HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-03-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-14-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2013-03-07HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 30
2013-03-07HousePass First Reading
2013-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 299) in amended form (SD 1).
2013-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-03-01SenateOne Day Notice 03-05-13.
2013-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 780) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2013-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi.
2013-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2013-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2013-02-12SenateReported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 196) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2013-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-13 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2013-01-24SenateReferred to CPN, WAM.
2013-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB861 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback