HI SB1094 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 267, 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1370).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes a general fund appropriation of $50,000,000 for fiscal year 2013-2014 to recapitalize the emergency and budget reserve fund. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; Emergency and Budget Reserve Fund ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateAct 267, 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1370).
2013-07-09HouseAct 267, on 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1370).
2013-05-07SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Ige.
2013-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
2013-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 133) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 133).
2013-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing.
2013-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Kidani, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2013-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 1:30PM in conference room 309.
2013-04-22HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 3:00PM in conference room 309.
2013-04-18HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 3:00PM in conference room 309.
2013-04-17HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 3:00PM in conference room 309.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Luke Chair; Ing, Nishimoto, Johanson.
2013-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
2013-04-15SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Ige, Chair; Chun Oakland, Kidani, Kouchi, Slom.
2013-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
2013-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2013-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 602).
2013-04-09HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, McKelvey excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-04-04HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2013-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1448) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-03-14HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-03-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-14-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2013-03-07HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 30
2013-03-07HousePass First Reading
2013-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 301) in amended form (SD 1).
2013-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
2013-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2013-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 555) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Tokuda.
2013-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-12-13 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2013-01-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2013-01-24SenateReferred to WAM.
2013-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB863 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback