HI SB11 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (H) Act 215, on 7/11/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (H) Act 215, on 7/11/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a task force to determine whether a new Department of the Sheriff is needed, and if its establishment is feasible and needed, to begin the planning process. Report to the Legislature. Effective July 1, 2011. (SB11 HD2)
Title
Department of the Sheriff; Task Force
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Malama Solomon [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | (H) Act 215, on 7/11/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319). | |
2011-07-12 | (S) Act 215, 7/11/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319). | |
2011-05-06 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 695). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Hee. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) One Day Notice 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-11 in disagreeing to the House amendments. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) The Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Ige, Kim, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 2:30PM in conference room 312. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 2:30PM in conference room 312. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-11 2:30PM in conference room 312. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Aquino, Cullen Co-Chairs; Awana, Saiki, Fontaine. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Kim, Kouchi, Wakai. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 409). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Awana excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1499) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-30-11 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Belatti, Chang, Tokioka excused (3). | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Reported from PBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1097) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Takai, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Souki. | |
2011-03-14 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBM on Thursday, 03-17-11 8:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to PBM, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 52) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) English, Kim . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 685) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kouchi ; 3 No(es): Senator(s) Kidani, English, Kim; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-11 9:20AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 346) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Referred to PGM, WAM. | |
2011-01-19 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-19 | (S) Introduced. |